WI SB393 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.11 (47) of the statutes; Relating to: a property tax exemption for a winter sports club. (FE)
Title
A property tax exemption for a winter sports club. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb393 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB393.pdf |