WI SB392 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 168.23 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: authority of the Department of Agriculture, Trade and Consumer Protection regarding motor vehicle fueling facilities.
Title
Authority of the Department of Agriculture, Trade and Consumer Protection regarding motor vehicle fueling facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 247 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LRB correction |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |