WI SB390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 48.546 and 938.546 of the statutes; Relating to: creating family treatment court and juvenile treatment court grant programs in the Department of Children and Families. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating family treatment court and juvenile treatment court grant programs in the Department of Children and Families. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-03SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 202
2018-04-02SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-02-07SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-01-16SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2018-01-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-16HouseRepresentative Barca added as a cosponsor
2018-01-16HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2018-01-16HouseRules suspended
2018-01-16HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-16HouseRead a second time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-01-11HouseRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2017-11-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-11-14HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2017-10-31HouseReceived from Senate
2017-10-31SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-10-31SenateSenator Miller added as a coauthor
2017-10-31SenateSenator Vinehout added as a coauthor
2017-10-31SenateRead a third time and passed
2017-10-31SenateRules suspended
2017-10-31SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-10-31SenateRead a second time
2017-10-27SenatePlaced on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-10-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-10-24SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-10-24SenateExecutive action taken
2017-10-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-10-19SenatePublic hearing held
2017-10-05SenateRepresentatives Kitchens and Bowen added as cosponsors
2017-09-27SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-09-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-09-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-08-24SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-08-24SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback