WI SB39 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.86 (1) (ac) of the statutes; Relating to: absentee ballot request and return confirmation. (FE)
Title
Absentee ballot request and return confirmation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-05 | Senate | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |