WI SB39 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-26-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 118.133 (1) (a), 118.133 (1) (b) and 118.133 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities and school district membership in an interscholastic athletic association in the 2021-22 school year. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities and school district membership in an interscholastic athletic association in the 2021-22 school year. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateReport vetoed by the Governor on 3-26-2021
2021-03-25SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-25-2021
2021-03-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-03-24SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-03-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 58, Noes 35, Paired 2
2021-03-23HouseRules suspended
2021-03-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23HouseRead a second time
2021-03-19HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-03-18HouseRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-03-17HousePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReceived from Senate
2021-03-16SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-16SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-03-16SenateRules suspended
2021-03-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-16SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2021-03-16SenateRead a second time
2021-03-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-03-12SenatePlaced on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-09SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-03-04SenateExecutive action taken
2021-03-04SenateRepresentative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
2021-02-23SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-16SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback