WI SB39 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 111.335 (3) (a); to renumber and amend 973.015 (1m) (a) 1.; to amend 111.335 (4) (b), 111.335 (4) (c) 1. (intro.), 111.335 (4) (e), 111.335 (4) (f) 1., 950.04 (1v) (g) and 973.015 (1m) (b); and to create 111.335 (3) (ag), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. a. and b., 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. c. and d. and 4., 973.015 (1m) (c) and 973.015 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of records of certain crimes. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expungement of records of certain crimes. (FE)

Sponsors

Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]
Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]
Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]
Sen. Jeff Smith [D]Sen. Patrick Testin [R]Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]
Sen. Robert Wirch [D]Rep. David Steffen [R]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Scott Allen [R]
Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Ed Brooks [R]
Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D]Rep. Dave Considine [D]Rep. David Crowley [D]
Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Kalan Haywood [D]Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]
Rep. Debra Kolste [D]Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. John Nygren [R]
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]
Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]
Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. John Spiros [R]
Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]
Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Robyn Vining [D]
Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2019-04-02SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-04-02SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2019-04-02SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken
2019-04-01SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2019-03-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-19SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-18SenateRepresentative Neubauer added as a cosponsor
2019-03-14SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-28SenateRepresentative Gruszynski added as a cosponsor
2019-02-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback