WI SB39 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 442.04 (2) and 442.04 (4) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: the notice and degree requirements for the examination to practice as a certified public accountant.
Title
The notice and degree requirements for the examination to practice as a certified public accountant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb39 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB39.pdf |