WI SB39 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Published 8-3-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Published 8-3-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.40 (1) (a), 45.40 (2) (c) and 45.40 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: cash value of life insurance regarding eligibility for the veterans assistance program.
Title
Cash value of life insurance regarding eligibility for the veterans assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Published 8-3-2009. | |
2009-07-23 | Report approved by the Governor on 7-20-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 37 | |
2009-07-20 | Presented to the Governor on 7-20-2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Report correctly enrolled on 6-30-2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-06-25 | Assembly amendment 1 concurred in | |
2009-06-24 | Placed on calendar 6-25-2009 by committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2009-06-23 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-06-23 | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-06-23 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-06-23 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended | |
2009-06-23 | Rules suspended | |
2009-06-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-06-23 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-06-23 | Read a second time | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on calendar 6-23-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-06-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-06-16 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2009-06-16 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 1 | |
2009-05-26 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2009-05-26 | Executive action taken | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2009-05-14 | Received from Senate | |
2009-05-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-05-13 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-05-13 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-05-13 | Read a second time | |
2009-05-13 | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor | |
2009-05-12 | Senator Hopper added as a coauthor | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on calendar 5-13-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-05-11 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-05-11 | Report passage recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-05-06 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-16 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced |