WI SB387 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.692 (1k) (am) 3.; and to create 59.692 (1) (ar) and 59.692 (1n) (d) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: county shoreland zoning ordinances relating to fences near public highways.
Title
County shoreland zoning ordinances relating to fences near public highways.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 105 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar of 10-27-2021 and take up |
2021-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 10-27-2021 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |