WI SB387 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.185 (1), 48.357 (1) (am) 1., 48.357 (2), 48.357 (2m) (b), 938.357 (2) and 938.357 (2m) (b); to amend 46.10 (1), 46.10 (14) (b), 46.10 (14) (e) 1., 46.10 (14) (g), 48.028 (2) (e), 48.028 (2) (f), 48.185 (2), 48.235 (1) (e), 48.299 (6) (e) 5., 48.315 (2m) (a), 48.32 (1) (b) 1. (intro.), 48.32 (1) (d) 1., 48.355 (2e) (b), 48.355 (4) (a), 48.355 (4) (b) 1., 48.355 (4) (b) 2., 48.355 (4) (b) 3., 48.355 (4) (b) 4., 48.355 (4) (c), 48.357 (title), 48.357 (1) (a), 48.357 (1) (am) 2. (intro.), 48.357 (1) (am) 2m., 48.357 (1) (am) 3., 48.357 (1) (c) 1., 48.357 (1) (c) 2., 48.357 (1) (c) 2m., 48.357 (1) (c) 3., 48.357 (2m) (a), 48.357 (2m) (bm), 48.357 (2m) (br), 48.357 (2m) (c), 48.357 (2r), 48.357 (2v) (a) 1., 48.357 (2v) (a) 1m., 48.357 (2v) (a) 2., 48.357 (2v) (a) 2m., 48.357 (2v) (d) 1., 48.357 (4d) (a), 48.357 (4d) (am), 48.357 (5m), 48.357 (6) (a) (intro.), 48.357 (6) (a) 1., 48.357 (6) (a) 2., 48.357 (6) (a) 3., 48.357 (6) (a) 4., 48.357 (6) (b), 48.358 (2) (a), 48.36 (1) (a), 48.365 (5) (a), 48.365 (5) (b) 1., 48.365 (5) (b) 2., 48.365 (5) (b) 3., 48.365 (5) (b) 4., 48.38 (4m) (title), 48.75 (1g) (d), 49.345 (1), 49.345 (2), 49.345 (14) (b), 49.345 (14) (e) 1., 49.345 (14) (g), 301.12 (1), 301.12 (2), 301.12 (14) (b), 301.12 (14) (e) 1., 301.12 (14) (g), 757.69 (1) (g) 6., 757.69 (1) (g) 8., 757.69 (1) (g) 9., 757.69 (1m) (d), 767.001 (1) (i), 767.001 (1) (m), 767.59 (1), 767.59 (2) (c), 767.77 (1), 767.78 (1), 780.01 (5), 893.415 (2), 938.028 (2) (c), 938.185 (2), 938.235 (1) (e), 938.299 (6) (e) 5., 938.30 (6) (b), 938.31 (7) (b), 938.315 (2m) (a), 938.32 (1) (c) 1. (intro.), 938.32 (1) (e) 1., 938.355 (2e) (b), 938.357 (title), 938.357 (1) (title), 938.357 (1) (a), 938.357 (1) (am) (title), 938.357 (1) (am) 1., 938.357 (1) (am) 2., 938.357 (1) (am) 2m., 938.357 (1) (am) 3., 938.357 (1) (c) (title), 938.357 (1) (c) 1., 938.357 (1) (c) 2., 938.357 (1) (c) 3., 938.357 (2m) (a), 938.357 (2m) (am) (title), 938.357 (2m) (br), 938.357 (2m) (c), 938.357 (2r), 938.357 (2v) (a) 1., 938.357 (2v) (a) 2., 938.357 (2v) (a) 2m., 938.357 (2v) (c) (title), 938.357 (4d) (am), 938.357 (5m) (a), 938.357 (6) (a) (intro.), 938.357 (6) (a) 2., 938.357 (6) (b), 938.358 (2) (a), 938.36 (1) (a), 938.363 (1) (c) and 938.38 (4m) (title); and to create 48.185 (4), 48.185 (5), 48.21 (5m), 48.213 (4m), 48.217, 48.255 (1) (cg), 48.32 (1) (am), 48.355 (4g), 48.357 (1) (title), 48.357 (1) (am) (title), 48.357 (1) (c) (title), 48.357 (2) (title), 48.357 (2) (b), 48.357 (2m) (title), 48.357 (2m) (am) (title), 48.357 (2m) (b) (title), 48.357 (2v) (title), 48.357 (2v) (a) (title), 48.357 (2v) (b) (title), 48.357 (2v) (c) (title), 48.357 (2v) (d) (title), 48.357 (4d) (title), 48.357 (4d) (b) (title), 48.357 (5r) (title), 48.357 (6) (title), 48.42 (1) (bm), 48.43 (8), 48.437, 757.69 (1) (g) 15., 938.21 (5m), 938.217, 938.255 (1) (cg), 938.32 (1) (bm), 938.355 (4g), 938.357 (2) (b), 938.357 (2v) (d) (title), 938.357 (4d) (a) (title) and 938.357 (4d) (b) (title) of the statutes; Relating to: procedures for changing the placement of a child who is subject to a temporary physical custody order or termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, procedures for amending a consent decree of the juvenile court, emergency change-in-placement procedures for a child who is placed in his or her own home under a dispositional order of the juvenile court, venue in post-dispositional proceedings under the Children's Code and Juvenile Justice Code, procedures for requesting and objecting to a proposed change in placement of a child and for changing the placement of a child when no objection is filed, the appointment of a successor guardian for a child who is subject to a termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, case closure orders with respect to a child whose dispositional order is terminated, and the effective period of a temporary physical custody order of the juvenile court. (FE)
Title
Procedures for changing the placement of a child who is subject to a temporary physical custody order or termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, procedures for amending a consent decree of the juvenile court, emergency change-in-placement procedures for a child who is placed in his or her own home under a dispositional order of the juvenile court, venue in post-dispositional proceedings under the Children's Code and Juvenile Justice Code, procedures for requesting and objecting to a proposed change in placement of a child and for changing the placement of a child when no objection is filed, the appointment of a successor guardian for a child who is subject to a termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, case closure orders with respect to a child whose dispositional order is terminated, and the effective period of a temporary physical custody order of the juvenile court. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 373 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LRB correction |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Introduced |