WI SB380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-24)
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 49.45 (29w) (b); to renumber 49.45 (29w) (a); to create 49.45 (61), 49.46 (2) (b) 21., 49.46 (2) (b) 22. and 49.46 (2) (b) 23. of the statutes; and to affect 2019 Wisconsin Act 9, section 9119 (2); Relating to: coverage of services under Medical Assistance provided through telehealth and other technologies, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage of services under Medical Assistance provided through telehealth and other technologies, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-11-08SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-11-07HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-07HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2019-11-07HouseRules suspended
2019-11-07HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-07HouseRead a second time
2019-11-07HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2019-11-05HouseRead first time and referred to calendar of 11-7-2019 pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (1)(a)
2019-11-05HouseReceived from Senate
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-28SenateRepresentative Wittke added as a cosponsor
2019-10-24SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Kooyenga and Bewley
2019-10-23SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-23SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-10-23SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-10-23SenateExecutive action taken
2019-10-21SenateLRB correction
2019-10-09SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-09-19SenateRepresentative Edming added as a cosponsor
2019-09-18SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Kooyenga and Bewley
2019-09-17SenateSenator Larson added as a coauthor
2019-09-10SenateRepresentative James added as a cosponsor
2019-09-09SenateRepresentative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
2019-08-29SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-08-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback