WI SB38 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 961.55 (8) and 968.19; to amend 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 59.54 (25m), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 66.0107 (1) (bp), 66.1201 (2m), 66.1213 (3), 66.1301 (2m), 66.1331 (2m), 66.1333 (3) (e) 2., 106.50 (1m) (h), 234.29, 289.33 (3) (d), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 767.41 (5) (am) (intro.), 767.451 (5m) (a), 961.555 (2) (a), 961.56 (1) and 968.20 (1g) (intro.); and to create 20.435 (1) (gq), 20.435 (1) (jm), subchapter IV of chapter 50 [precedes 50.59], 59.54 (25) (c), 66.0414, 146.44, 767.41 (5) (d), 767.451 (5m) (d), 961.01 (3), 961.01 (5m), 961.01 (11v), 961.01 (12v), 961.01 (14c), 961.01 (14g), 961.01 (17k), 961.01 (19m), 961.01 (20hm), 961.01 (20ht), 961.01 (20t), 961.01 (21f), 961.01 (21t), 961.436, 961.55 (8) (b), 961.55 (8) (c), 961.55 (8) (d), 961.555 (2) (e), 961.555 (2m), 961.5755, 968.072, 968.12 (6), 968.19 (2) and 968.20 (1j) of the statutes; Relating to: medical use of marijuana, the regulation of marijuana distribution entities, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical use of marijuana, the regulation of marijuana distribution entities, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-06SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-06SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-02SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-01SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-02-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback