WI SB379 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 120.12 (27) of the statutes; relating to: notification of school closings and reopenings.
Title
Notification of school closings and reopenings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Published 5-26-2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-12-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 305 | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to the Governor on 5-11-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-23-2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:14 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-04-13 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-13 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-05 | Report passage recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-25 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2009-11-03 | Introduced |