WI SB378 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 108.04 (2) (bb) (intro.) and 108.04 (2) (bd) (intro.); and to create 108.04 (2) (be) of the statutes; Relating to: work search requirements for unemployment insurance and the suspension of a rule of the Department of Workforce Development.
Title
Work search requirements for unemployment insurance and the suspension of a rule of the Department of Workforce Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-30-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |