WI SB375 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.03 (11m) (a) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) 72., 440.08 (2) (a) 69., 452.01 (4d), 452.01 (4h), 452.01 (4p), 452.01 (4t), 452.01 (9), 452.025, 452.025 (4), 452.09 (1) (c), 452.09 (5), 452.10 (4) (a), 452.12 (6), 452.137 (1) (b), 452.137 (1) (d) and 452.17 (2); to renumber and amend 452.03, 452.10 (4) (b) and 452.19; to consolidate, renumber and amend 440.03 (11m) (a) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 73.0301 (1) (a), 108.227 (1) (b), 186.113 (19), 440.03 (11m) (am), 440.03 (11m) (b), 440.03 (11m) (c), 440.13 (2) (c), 452.01 (1m), 452.01 (3) (d), 452.01 (3e), 452.01 (3m), 452.01 (3s), 452.01 (3w), 452.01 (4), 452.01 (5), 452.01 (5), 452.01 (5j), 452.01 (5m) (b), 452.01 (5p), 452.01 (5p), 452.01 (5w), 452.01 (7), 452.01 (7r), 452.01 (9), 452.025 (1) (b) 3., 452.025 (3) (a), 452.025 (3) (b) 2. g., 452.05 (1) (a), 452.05 (1) (a), 452.05 (1) (i) (intro.), 452.05 (1) (i) 1., 452.05 (1) (i) 3. b., 452.07 (1m), 452.07 (2), 452.07 (2), 452.09 (1) (b), 452.09 (2) (c) (intro.), 452.09 (3) (a), 452.09 (4) (a) 1., 452.10 (1), 452.10 (2) (a), 452.11 (1), 452.12 (2) (a), 452.12 (2) (c), 452.12 (3), 452.12 (4), 452.12 (5) (b), 452.12 (5) (c), 452.13 (1) (a), 452.13 (2) (a), 452.13 (2) (b), 452.13 (2) (bm), 452.13 (2) (c), 452.13 (2) (e) (intro.), 452.13 (2) (e) 2., 452.13 (2) (f) 1., 452.13 (3), 452.13 (4), 452.13 (5), 452.132 (2) (c), 452.133 (title), 452.133 (1) (intro.), (c), (d), (e), (f) and (g), 452.133 (2) (intro.), (a) 1. and 2., (b) and (c), 452.133 (3), 452.133 (4) (a) and (b) 1. and 2., 452.133 (5), 452.133 (6) (intro.) and (a), 452.134 (1) (a), 452.134 (1) (b), 452.134 (2), 452.134 (3), 452.134 (4), 452.135 (1) and (2), 452.137 (2) (a) 1., 452.137 (2) (a) 2., 452.137 (2) (b) 1., 452.137 (2) (b) 2., 452.137 (2) (c), 452.137 (2) (d), 452.137 (2) (e), 452.137 (2) (f), 452.137 (2) (g), 452.137 (3) (intro.), 452.137 (3) (c), 452.137 (3) (c), 452.137 (4) (a), 452.137 (4) (b) (intro.), 452.137 (4) (b) 1., 452.137 (4) (b) 3., 452.138, 452.139 (1), (2) and (3), 452.14 (1), 452.14 (2), 452.14 (3) (intro.), 452.14 (3) (a), 452.14 (3) (b), 452.14 (3) (c), 452.14 (3) (d), 452.14 (3) (f), 452.14 (3) (g), 452.14 (3) (h), 452.14 (3) (i), 452.14 (3) (j), 452.14 (3) (jm), 452.14 (3) (k), 452.14 (3) (L), 452.14 (3) (m), 452.14 (3) (p), 452.14 (4), 452.14 (4m) (intro.), 452.14 (4m) (a), 452.14 (4m) (b), 452.14 (4r), 452.15 (1) and (2), 452.17 (4) (a), 452.17 (4) (a) 1. and 2., 452.19 (1), 452.20, 452.21, 452.22 (2), 452.23 (1), 452.23 (2) (intro.), 452.23 (2) (b), 452.23 (3), 452.23 (4), 452.24 (2), 452.25 (1) (a), 452.25 (1) (b), 452.25 (1) (c) 2., 452.25 (1) (d), 452.25 (1) (e), 452.25 (2) (b), 452.30 (7) (b), 707.55 (5) and 707.55 (7); to repeal and recreate 452.01 (7), 452.14 (3) (intro.) and 452.19 (title); and to create 452.01 (1o), 452.01 (1p), 452.01 (3) (i), 452.01 (4w), 452.01 (4x), 452.01 (4y), 452.01 (5c), 452.03 (2), 452.05 (1) (j), 452.12 (5) (bm), 452.132, 452.133 (4m), 452.142, 452.19 (2), 452.30, 452.34, 452.38, 452.40 and 452.42 of the statutes; Relating to: various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, employment relationships between real estate licensees and real estate brokerage firms, a statute of limitations for actions against persons engaged in real estate practice, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, employment relationships between real estate licensees and real estate brokerage firms, a statute of limitations for actions against persons engaged in real estate practice, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lasee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-12-03 | Senate | LRB correction |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb375 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB375.pdf |