WI SB373 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Published 11-6-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Published 11-6-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (13m) of the statutes; Relating to: making school district and school financial information available to the public. (FE)
Title
Making school district and school financial information available to the public. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Senate | Published 11-6-2021 |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-5-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 89 |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-4-2021 |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2021-09-28 | House | Read |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 12 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Larson, Johnson, Smith, L. Taylor, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Agard, Wirch, Pfaff, Bewley, Ringhand and Roys |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Larson, Johnson and Smith |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Felzkowski |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |