WI SB370 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 177.01 (3) and (4), 177.01 (8) (a) to (c), 177.01 (10) and (11), 177.02, 177.03, 177.04, 177.05, 177.06, 177.07, 177.075, 177.08, 177.10, 177.11, 177.13, 177.14, 177.15, 177.16, 177.17, 177.19, 177.20, 177.21, 177.22, 177.23, 177.24, 177.25, 177.26, 177.265, 177.27, 177.28, 177.29, 177.31, 177.32, 177.33, 177.34, 177.35 and 177.36; to renumber 177.015, 177.09, 177.30 (title), 177.30 (7), 177.38, 177.40 and 177.41; to renumber and amend 177.01 (6), 177.01 (8) (intro.), 177.01 (12), 177.12, 177.135, 177.165, 177.18, 177.225, 177.255, 177.30 (2), 177.30 (3), 177.30 (4), 177.30 (5), 177.30 (6) and 177.37; to amend 20.437 (2) (qm), 20.566 (4) (a), 20.566 (4) (j), 62.63 (5), 71.93 (1) (d) 2., 71.93 (3) (a) (intro.), 73.01 (4) (a), 177.01 (1), 177.01 (2), 177.01 (5), 177.01 (7), 177.01 (9), 177.01 (13), 177.01 (15), 177.015 (title), 193.735 (1) (intro.), 193.735 (2), 610.61, 632.63 (4), 863.37 (2) (a), 863.39 (1), 863.39 (3) (a) and 893.95; and to create 73.03 (75), subchapter I (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.001], 177.001, 177.01 (1d), 177.01 (5d), 177.01 (6) (a) to (d), 177.01 (6d), 177.01 (6f), 177.01 (6g), 177.01 (7b), 177.01 (7d), 177.01 (11d), 177.01 (11f), 177.01 (11g), 177.01 (11j), 177.01 (11m), 177.01 (12) (d), 177.01 (12d), 177.01 (13b), 177.01 (13d), 177.01 (13f), 177.01 (13h), 177.01 (13j), 177.01 (14d), 177.01 (16), 177.01 (17), 177.015 (2), subchapter II (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0201], 177.0201, 177.0202, 177.0203, 177.0204, 177.0205, 177.0207, 177.0208, 177.0210, 177.0211, 177.0212, 177.0214, subchapter III (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0301], 177.0301, 177.0302, 177.0303, 177.0304, 177.0305, 177.0306, 177.0307, 177.0308, subchapter IV (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0401], 177.0401, 177.0402, 177.0403, 177.0404, 177.0405, 177.0406, subchapter V (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0501], 177.0501, 177.0502, 177.0503 (1b), 177.0503 (1d), 177.0503 (2n), 177.0504, 177.0505, subchapter VI (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0601], 177.0601, 177.0602, 177.0603, 177.0604, 177.0605, 177.0606, 177.0607, 177.0608, 177.0609, 177.0610, subchapter VII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0701], 177.0701, 177.0702, 177.0703, 177.0704, subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0801], 177.0801, 177.0802, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0901], 177.0901, 177.0902, 177.0903, 177.0904, 177.0905, 177.0906, subchapter X (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1001], 177.1001, 177.1002 (3), 177.1002 (4), 177.1003, subchapter XI (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1101], 177.1101, 177.1102, 177.1103, 177.1104, subchapter XII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1201], 177.1201, 177.1202, 177.1203, 177.1204, 177.1205, 177.1206, subchapter XIII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1301], 177.1301, 177.1302, subchapter XIV (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1401], 177.1401, 177.1402, 177.1403, subchapter XV (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1501] and 177.1505 of the statutes; Relating to: the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. (FE)
Title
The Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senator Smith added as a coauthor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |