WI SB37 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.07 (3) (a) 3., 125.32 (3) (c) and 125.68 (4) (c) 4.; and to create 125.02 (11m) and 125.32 (3m) (i) of the statutes; Relating to: the issuance of retail alcohol beverage licenses for premises on which another business is conducted and the presence of underage persons on premises operating under a retail alcohol beverage license. (FE)
Title
The issuance of retail alcohol beverage licenses for premises on which another business is conducted and the presence of underage persons on premises operating under a retail alcohol beverage license. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Published 4-9-2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 8 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-03-17 | House | Read |
2015-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |