WI SB367 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 609.28 of the statutes; Relating to: dental provider network rental by insurance plans.
Title
Dental provider network rental by insurance plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-08 | Senate | LRB correction |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb367 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB367.pdf |