WI SB366 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 5.25 (3); and to create 5.25 (3) (a) 1., 2. and 3., 5.25 (3) (b) and 5.25 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: polling place closures.
Title
Polling place closures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Taylor |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Representatives O'Connor and Cabrera added as cosponsors |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Introduced |