WI SB366 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Representatives Ohnstad, Sinicki and Snodgrass withdrawn as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 951.02, 951.18 (1) and 951.18 (4) (c); and to create 951.01 (3c) of the statutes; Relating to: grievous bodily harm to or the death of an animal and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grievous bodily harm to or the death of an animal and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reject Senate Substitute Amendment 1 (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14HouseRepresentatives Ohnstad, Sinicki and Snodgrass withdrawn as cosponsors
2021-09-28HouseReceived from Senate
2021-09-28SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-09-28SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-09-28SenateRules suspended
2021-09-28SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-09-28SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2021-09-28SenateRefused to reject Senate Substitute Amendment 1, Ayes 10, Noes 21
2021-09-28SenateRead a second time
2021-09-27SenateSenators Carpenter and Smith withdrawn as coauthors
2021-09-24SenatePlaced on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-09-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-09-16SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 2
2021-09-16SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 2
2021-09-16SenateExecutive action taken
2021-09-14SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2021-09-09SenatePublic hearing held
2021-08-25SenateRepresentative Baldeh withdrawn as a cosponsor
2021-06-03SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2021-05-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-05-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback