WI SB365 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 196.504 (1) (b) and 196.504 (2) (d); to renumber and amend 196.504 (2) (c); to amend 24.40 (3), 86.16 (6), 196.504 (1) (c) 2., 196.504 (2) (a) and 196.504 (3) (intro.); and to create 196.504 (2) (c) 1. b., 196.504 (2) (c) 3., 196.504 (2) (f), 196.504 (2e) and 196.504 (2t) of the statutes; Relating to: the broadband expansion grant program. (FE)
Title
The broadband expansion grant program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 36, Paired 2 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:46 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |