WI SB364 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 350.02 (2) (b) 4. a. and 350.02 (2) (b) 4. c.; to renumber and amend 350.02 (2) (b) 4. (intro.); and to amend 350.01 (17), 350.09 (1), 350.095 (1) (b) and 350.095 (2) (d) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: snowmobile noise and the operation of snowmobiles, all-terrain vehicles, and utility terrain vehicles near highways.
Title
Snowmobile noise and the operation of snowmobiles, all-terrain vehicles, and utility terrain vehicles near highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 103 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-11-02 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-15 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |