WI SB361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.115 (4) (a), 450.115 (4) (b) and 450.115 (4) (c); and to create 450.115 (1) (am) and 450.115 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: hospice staff transferring the controlled substances of deceased persons to drug disposal programs.
Title
Hospice staff transferring the controlled substances of deceased persons to drug disposal programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb361 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB361.pdf |