WI SB36 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Published 5-9-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Published 5-9-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 41.11 (5), 41.12 (3) and 41.24 (3); and to amend 41.11 (1) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the Department of Tourism's reporting duties and repealing requirements to distribute cheese, submit a financial statement, and use famous residents in marketing.
Title
Modifying the Department of Tourism's reporting duties and repealing requirements to distribute cheese, submit a financial statement, and use famous residents in marketing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Published 5-9-2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 5-8-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 7 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-04-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2023-04-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-04-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a second time |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-04-12 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |