WI SB354 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 108.04 (2) (bb) (intro.) and 108.04 (2) (bd) (intro.); and to create 108.04 (2) (be) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in federal unemployment benefit programs and work search requirements for unemployment insurance. (FE)
Title
Participation in federal unemployment benefit programs and work search requirements for unemployment insurance. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-9-2021 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Representative Oldenburg added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |