WI SB352 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Published 3-17-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Published 3-17-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.41 (1) (a), 961.41 (1m) (a), 961.41 (1r), 961.49 (1m) (intro.), 971.365 (1) (a), 971.365 (1) (b) and 971.365 (2); and to create 961.41 (1) (dm) and 961.41 (1m) (dm) of the statutes; Relating to: manufacturing, distributing, or delivering fentanyl or fentanyl analogs and providing a penalty.
Title
Manufacturing, distributing, or delivering fentanyl or fentanyl analogs and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Published 3-17-2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-16-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 179 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |