WI SB351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 77.54 (69) of the statutes; Relating to: a sales tax exemption for tangible personal property temporarily stored in this state. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A sales tax exemption for tangible personal property temporarily stored in this state. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 9
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-04SenatePlaced on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-04SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-10-04SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-09-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-25SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 5, Noes 4
2019-09-25SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-09-25SenateExecutive action taken
2019-09-19SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
2019-09-18SenatePublic hearing held
2019-09-03SenateRepresentative Tusler added as a cosponsor
2019-08-29SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-08-22SenateRepresentative Novak added as a cosponsor
2019-08-21SenateRepresentative Ballweg added as a cosponsor
2019-08-14SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2019-08-14SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback