WI SB351 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 710.15 (5r); and to create 77.25 (19), 100.20 (1w) and 710.16 of the statutes; relating to: requirements before a sale or other transfer of a manufactured and mobile home community, providing an exemption from the real estate transfer fee, and providing a penalty.
Title
Requirements before a sale or other transfer of a manufactured and mobile home community, providing an exemption from the real estate transfer fee, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Rep. Andrew Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] |
Sen. Kelda Roys [D] | Sen. Robert Wirch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-31 | Report of joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions requested | |
2010-03-26 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-08 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-12 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach | |
2009-11-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-10-16 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb351 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB351.pdf |