WI SB345 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 64.09 (3); and to create 66.0502 (4) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing limited residency requirements for a city operating under the city manager plan. (FE)
Title
Authorizing limited residency requirements for a city operating under the city manager plan. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb345 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB345.pdf |