WI SB344 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-14)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 944.30 (1m) (intro.) and 944.30 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prosecuting a person under the age of 18 with committing an act of prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecuting a person under the age of 18 with committing an act of prostitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-22HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and passed
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-07SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing held
2017-10-05SenateRepresentative Kitchens added as a cosponsor
2017-09-01SenateRepresentative Barca added as a cosponsor
2017-07-13SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-07-13SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback