WI SB343 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.92 (1) (a) 5., 13.94 (1) (c), 35.84 (intro.) and (figure) column E (title), 84.02 (5) (b) and 84.02 (5) (c); and to create 35.84 (figure) column F of the statutes; Relating to: distribution of Wisconsin Blue Book and highway maps. (FE)
Title
Distribution of Wisconsin Blue Book and highway maps. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb343 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB343.pdf |