WI SB341 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 146.40 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: hours of instructional program for nurse aids.
Title
Hours of instructional program for nurse aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Representatives Macco and Kremer added as cosponsors |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb341 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB341.pdf |