WI SB341 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.07 (2) (k) and 348.10 (1); and to create 348.05 (2) (m) of the statutes; Relating to: the maximum width of, and projecting loads on, vehicles carrying poles, pipe, girders, and similar materials.
Title
The maximum width of, and projecting loads on, vehicles carrying poles, pipe, girders, and similar materials.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Neal Kedzie [R] |
Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Christopher Danou [D] |
Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. John Nygren [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] | Rep. Mary Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 369 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Wright added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-11-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |