WI SB338 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: unemployment insurance contribution rates. (FE)
Title
Unemployment insurance contribution rates. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |