WI SB338 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.445 (1) (b) and 20.445 (1) (bm); and to create 49.162 (1) (c) 4. and 106.38 of the statutes; Relating to: creating the Hire Heroes program to provide transitional jobs to veterans and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Creating the Hire Heroes program to provide transitional jobs to veterans and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Representatives Shankland and Steffen added as cosponsors |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb338 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB338.pdf |