WI SB337 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 16.42 (1) (f), 16.423 and 16.46 (5g) of the statutes; Relating to: submission of base budget review reports by state agencies, the legislature, and the courts. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Submission of base budget review reports by state agencies, the legislature, and the courts. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-03SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 212
2018-04-02SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-02-27SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-02-20SenateAction ordered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-01-24SenateReceived from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-01-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-23HouseRead a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 59, Noes 33
2018-01-23HouseRules suspended
2018-01-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-23HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-01-23HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton
2018-01-23HouseRead a second time
2018-01-23HouseRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
2018-01-23HouseWithdrawn from committee on State Affairs and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
2018-01-17HouseRepresentative Brostoff withdrawn as a cosponsor
2017-11-14HouseRead first time and referred to committee on State Affairs
2017-11-07HouseReceived from Senate
2017-11-07SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-07SenateRead a third time and passed
2017-11-07SenateRules suspended
2017-11-07SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2017-11-07SenateRead a second time
2017-11-03SenatePlaced on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-10-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-10-24SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-10-24SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-10-19SenateExecutive action taken
2017-10-12SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig
2017-08-31SenatePublic hearing held
2017-07-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-07-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-07-26SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-07-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-07-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-07-13SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
2017-07-13SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback