WI SB336 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.04 (1) (g), 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 36.09 (1) (e), 36.11 (3) (a), 36.12 (1), 38.04 (13) (b), 38.23 (1), 47.02 (3m) (f), 51.90, 66.1011 (1), 66.1201 (2m), 66.1213 (3), 66.1301 (2m), 66.1331 (2m), 66.1333 (3) (e) 2., 86.195 (5) (c), 106.50 (1), 106.50 (1m) (h), 106.50 (1m) (nm), 106.50 (5m) (f) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 2., 106.52 (3) (a) 3., 106.52 (3) (a) 4., 106.52 (3) (a) 5., 106.58, 111.31 (1), 111.31 (2), 111.31 (3), 111.321, 111.70 (2), 111.81 (12) (b), 111.85 (2) (b), 118.019 (2d), 118.13 (1), 118.20 (1), 118.40 (4) (b) 2., 194.025, 224.77 (1) (o), 227.10 (3) (a), 230.01 (2) (b), 230.18, 234.29, 440.45 (1), 440.45 (2), 452.14 (3) (n), 625.12 (2), 632.35 and 756.001 (3); and to create 48.82 (7), 106.50 (1m) (v), 106.52 (1) (h), 111.32 (15), 111.373 and 628.34 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting discrimination based on vaccination status. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting discrimination based on vaccination status. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report passage without recommendation, pursuant to Senate Rule 27 (4)(a), by Committee on Health, Ayes 2, Noes 2 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Representative Behnke added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |