WI SB336 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1109 (3) (c); to amend 66.1109 (4); and to create 66.1109 (3) (c) 1., 66.1109 (3) (c) 2., 66.1109 (3) (cg) and 66.1109 (3) (cr) of the statutes; Relating to: public annual reports of business improvement districts. (FE)
Title
Public annual reports of business improvement districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb336 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB336.pdf |