WI SB331 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Passed on December 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-10 - Published 12-11-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Passed on December 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-10 - Published 12-11-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.255 (2) (ct) and 115.367 of the statutes; Relating to: career and technical education incentive grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Career and technical education incentive grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-05 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-05 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-05 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-10 | Senate | Published 12-11-2013 |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-10-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 59 |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-9-2013 |
2013-11-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | House | Representative Wright added as a cosponsor |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2013-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 55, Noes 40 |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Mason, Riemer, Kessler and Hulsey |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hulsey |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-5-2013 |
2013-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Gudex |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-10-04 | Senate | Introduced |