WI SB325 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 941.318, 961.14 (4) (te), (th), (tL), (tp), (tr), (tu) and (ty) and 961.14 (7) (m) and (n); to amend 59.54 (25g), 66.0107 (1) (bn), 961.14 (4) (intro.), 961.14 (7) (intro.), 961.41 (1) (e) (intro.), 961.41 (1) (hm) (intro.), 961.41 (1m) (e) (intro.), 961.41 (1m) (hm) (intro.), 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (3g) (d) and 961.41 (3g) (em); to repeal and recreate 961.14 (4) (tb) and 961.14 (7) (L); and to create 961.14 (4) (sm), 961.14 (4) (uv), 961.14 (4) (wa), 961.14 (4) (wb), 961.14 (4) (wk), 961.14 (4) (wL), 961.14 (4) (wm), 961.14 (4) (wn), 961.14 (4) (wo), 961.14 (4) (wp), 961.14 (4) (wq), 961.14 (4) (wr), 961.14 (4) (ws), 961.14 (4) (wv), 961.14 (4) (ww), 961.14 (4) (wx), 961.14 (4) (wy), 961.14 (4) (wz), 961.14 (4) (xa), 961.14 (4) (xb), 961.14 (7) (mk), 961.14 (7) (mL), 961.14 (7) (mm), 961.14 (7) (mn), 961.16 (3) (tb), 961.16 (3) (zt), 961.16 (8) (b), 961.18 (7) (am), 961.18 (7) (az), 961.18 (7) (em), 961.20 (2) (ax), 961.20 (2) (q), 961.20 (4) (d), 961.22 (4), 961.22 (5), 961.41 (1) (em) and 961.41 (1m) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: controlled substances, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-24SenatePublished 4-24-2014
2014-04-24SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 351
2014-04-22SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-22-2014
2014-02-10SenateReport correctly enrolled
2014-01-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2014-01-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2014-01-21HouseRepresentative Vruwink added as a cosponsor
2014-01-21HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2014-01-21HouseRules suspended
2014-01-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2014-01-21HouseRead a second time
2014-01-16HousePlaced on calendar 1-21-2014 by Committee on Rules
2013-11-25HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2013-11-05HouseReceived from Senate
2013-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2013-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2013-11-05SenateRules suspended
2013-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2013-11-05SenateRead a second time
2013-11-05SenateSenator Miller added as a coauthor
2013-11-04SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2013-10-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2013-10-25SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2013-10-24SenateExecutive action taken
2013-10-21SenateFiscal estimate received
2013-10-18SenateFiscal estimate received
2013-10-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2013-10-09SenatePublic hearing held
2013-10-02SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor
2013-10-02SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback