WI SB322 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 227.135 (2); and to create 13.92 (2) (jg), 35.93 (2) (b) 3. fm., 35.93 (2) (b) 3. gm., 227.138, 227.26 (4) and 227.29 of the statutes; Relating to: review by state agencies of administrative rules and enactments; an expedited process for repealing rules an agency no longer has the authority to promulgate; retrospective economic impact analyses for rules; and reporting by the Legislative Reference Bureau on rules in need of revision. (FE)
Title
Review by state agencies of administrative rules and enactments; an expedited process for repealing rules an agency no longer has the authority to promulgate; retrospective economic impact analyses for rules; and reporting by the Legislative Reference Bureau on rules in need of revision. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb322 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB322.pdf |