WI SB321 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 194.03 (6); and to amend 194.03 (title), 194.03 (1), 194.03 (2), 194.20 (title) and 194.20 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: applying motor carrier regulations to motor carriers operating in intrastate commerce. (FE)
Title
Applying motor carrier regulations to motor carriers operating in intrastate commerce. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb321 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB321.pdf |