WI SB320 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.11 (1); and to create 348.01 (2) (bb), 348.10 (6) and 348.11 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: transport of radiological materials and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Transport of radiological materials and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb320 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB320.pdf |