WI SB32 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 446.02 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: sponsors of nutritional counseling education programs and repealing and modifying administrative rules related to sponsors of nutritional counseling education programs. (FE)
Title
Sponsors of nutritional counseling education programs and repealing and modifying administrative rules related to sponsors of nutritional counseling education programs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |