WI SB318 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 941.29 (1g) (a); to amend 165.845 (2); and to create 165.63 (2) (c), 165.845 (1m), 175.35 (2g) (d) 3., 941.29 (1g) (ad) and 941.29 (1m) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: the possession of a firearm by a person who is a fugitive from justice and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The possession of a firearm by a person who is a fugitive from justice and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced |