WI SB313 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.69 (5) (b), 59.69 (5) (e) 2. and 59.69 (5) (e) 6.; and to create 59.69 (5) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: the method used by a county clerk to notify town clerks of certain county zoning actions. (FE)
Title
The method used by a county clerk to notify town clerks of certain county zoning actions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 214 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:21 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |