WI SB311 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.07 (8m) and 71.10 (4) (cs) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit based on the federal tax credit for certain expenses for household and dependent care services. (FE)
Title
Creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit based on the federal tax credit for certain expenses for household and dependent care services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Senator Harris Dodd added as a coauthor |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb311 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB311.pdf |