WI SB311 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 447.06 (2) (c) 4.; to amend 447.065 (2); and to create 447.02 (2) (f), 447.04 (2) (d) and 447.06 (2) (e) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: a dental hygienist's administration of nitrous oxide inhalation analgesia and practice of dental hygiene. (FE)
Title
A dental hygienist's administration of nitrous oxide inhalation analgesia and practice of dental hygiene. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 354 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Representatives Kolste, Barca and Smith added as cosponsors |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-01-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-14-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |