WI SB310 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 45.44 (3) (c) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: license fee waivers for veterans' spouses. (FE)
Title
License fee waivers for veterans' spouses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced |